THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:34:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wong (CPSO#: 69250 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
9058131100

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wong (CPSO#: 69250 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
9058131100

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY DOUG-YUAN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY DOUG-YUAN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995