THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:16:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20-9665 Bayview Ave
Richmond Hill ON L4C 9V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-881-0900
Fax: 905-881-0906
Address: Suite 5-6
9019 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3M6
Phone: (905) 886-1110
Fax: (905) 886-9996

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Godwin Tang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Tang (CPSO#: 69263 )
Business Address: 20-9665 Bayview Ave
Richmond Hill ON L4C 9V4

Corporation Name: Choy & Tang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Apr 2013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20-9665 Bayview Ave
Richmond Hill ON L4C 9V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-881-0900
Fax: 905-881-0906
Address: Suite 5-6
9019 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3M6
Phone: (905) 886-1110
Fax: (905) 886-9996

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Godwin Tang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Tang (CPSO#: 69263 )
Business Address: 20-9665 Bayview Ave
Richmond Hill ON L4C 9V4

Corporation Name: Choy & Tang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Apr 2013

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GODWIN POK YIN TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GODWIN POK YIN TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995