THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:59:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Paul Family Health Network
St. Joseph's Lifecare Centre
4th Floor Box 119
99 Wayne Gretsky Parkway
Brantford Ontario N3S 6T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 756-6400
Fax: (519) 756-7343

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anne Marie Connelly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Connelly (CPSO#: 69268 )
Business Address: St. Paul Family Health Network
St. Joseph's Lifecare Centre
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford Ontario N3S 6T6
(519) 756-6400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Paul Family Health Network
St. Joseph's Lifecare Centre
4th Floor Box 119
99 Wayne Gretsky Parkway
Brantford Ontario N3S 6T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 756-6400
Fax: (519) 756-7343

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anne Marie Connelly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Connelly (CPSO#: 69268 )
Business Address: St. Paul Family Health Network
St. Joseph's Lifecare Centre
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford Ontario N3S 6T6
(519) 756-6400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE MARIE CONNELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONNELLY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE MARIE CONNELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONNELLY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995