THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/04/25 06:14:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-941-2410
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 35 Giles Rd
Caledon Ontario L7K 0B7
Phone: (416) 567-8079
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Headwaters Healthcare Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R.M. Milkovich, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Milkovich (CPSO#: 69284 )
Business Address: Headwaters Healthcare Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410

Corporation Name: Drs. Wojtasik Milkovich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Sep 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-941-2410
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 35 Giles Rd
Caledon Ontario L7K 0B7
Phone: (416) 567-8079
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Headwaters Healthcare Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R.M. Milkovich, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Milkovich (CPSO#: 69284 )
Business Address: Headwaters Healthcare Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410

Corporation Name: Drs. Wojtasik Milkovich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Sep 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT MATTHEW MILKOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILKOVICH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT MATTHEW MILKOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILKOVICH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995