THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:18:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calcutta, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI, TAMIL, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Queens Plate Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 0B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 741-2079
Fax: (416) 741-2817
Address: 25 Sheppard Avenue West
Suite 650
Toronto
Toronto Ontario M2N 6S6
Phone: (416) 225-4440
Fax: 416 640 9454

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Prema Vaidyanathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Vaidyanathan (CPSO#: 69291 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI, TAMIL, URDU
Medical School: University of Calcutta, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Queens Plate Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 0B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 741-2079
Fax: (416) 741-2817
Address: 25 Sheppard Avenue West
Suite 650
Toronto
Toronto Ontario M2N 6S6
Phone: (416) 225-4440
Fax: 416 640 9454

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Prema Vaidyanathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Vaidyanathan (CPSO#: 69291 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PREMA VAIDYANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAIDYANATHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PREMA VAIDYANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAIDYANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calcutta, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995