THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:58:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C-41 Norfolk St S
Simcoe ON N3Y 0H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1866 768-4818
Fax: 519-426-0971
Address: 2757 King St E
Hamilton Ontario L8G 5E4
Phone: (905) 573-4801
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 660 Ireland rd
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 4K2
Phone: 15194263561
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 05 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Garside Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Garside (CPSO#: 69333 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C-41 Norfolk St S
Simcoe ON N3Y 0H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1866 768-4818
Fax: 519-426-0971
Address: 2757 King St E
Hamilton Ontario L8G 5E4
Phone: (905) 573-4801
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 660 Ireland rd
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 4K2
Phone: 15194263561
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 05 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Garside Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Garside (CPSO#: 69333 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH LOUISE GARSIDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARSIDE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH LOUISE GARSIDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARSIDE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995