THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:01:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 72 Bridge Street
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 2V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 253-8192
Fax: (613) 253-2566

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Potvin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Potvin (CPSO#: 69339 )
Business Address: 350 John St N
Arnprior ON K7S 2P6
613-623-3166
Business Address: 211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1T4
(613) 257-2200
Business Address: 72 Bridge Street
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 2V3
(613) 253-8192
Business Address: 75 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
(613) 256-2500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 72 Bridge Street
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 2V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 253-8192
Fax: (613) 253-2566

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Potvin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Potvin (CPSO#: 69339 )
Business Address: 350 John St N
Arnprior ON K7S 2P6
613-623-3166
Business Address: 211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1T4
(613) 257-2200
Business Address: 72 Bridge Street
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 2V3
(613) 253-8192
Business Address: 75 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
(613) 256-2500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM REGINALD POTVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTVIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM REGINALD POTVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTVIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995