THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:42:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: New York Univ School of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue, Rm HG40
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-5910
Fax: (416) 480-4845

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 27 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jill Tinmouth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tinmouth (CPSO#: 69342 )
Business Address: 13N-1300 - 585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-5077
Business Address: Sunnybrook and Women's College
Health Sciences Centre
HG40 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5910

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: New York Univ School of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue, Rm HG40
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-5910
Fax: (416) 480-4845

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 27 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jill Tinmouth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tinmouth (CPSO#: 69342 )
Business Address: 13N-1300 - 585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-5077
Business Address: Sunnybrook and Women's College
Health Sciences Centre
HG40 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5910

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JILL MARGARET TINMOUTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TINMOUTH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JILL MARGARET TINMOUTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TINMOUTH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: New York Univ School of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995