THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:59:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 13278 Tecumseh Road
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-5763
Fax: (519) 254-6356
Address: Suite 106
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 254-5763
Fax: (519) 254-6356

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Jasey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Jasey (CPSO#: 69364 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 13278 Tecumseh Road
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-5763
Fax: (519) 254-6356
Address: Suite 106
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 254-5763
Fax: (519) 254-6356

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Jasey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Jasey (CPSO#: 69364 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY SAID JASEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JASEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY SAID JASEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JASEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995