THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:49:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Welsford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Welsford (CPSO#: 69388 )
Business Address: 1358 Gallery Hill
Oakville ON L6M 2N2
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences CPER
201 - 430 McNeilly Road
Stoney Creek Ontario L8E 5E3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 71226

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Welsford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Welsford (CPSO#: 69388 )
Business Address: 1358 Gallery Hill
Oakville ON L6M 2N2
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences CPER
201 - 430 McNeilly Road
Stoney Creek Ontario L8E 5E3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 71226

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE WELSFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELSFORD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE WELSFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELSFORD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995