THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:57:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brant Community Health
Care System
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: John Noble Home
97 Mount Pleasant Road
Brantford Ontario N3T 1T5
Phone: (519) 756-2920
Fax: (519) 756-7942
Address: Stedman Community Hospice
Hankinson House
445 Grey Street
Brantford Ontario N3S 6X1
Phone: 5197517096
Extension: 2500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Janice M Legere Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Legere (CPSO#: 69438 )
Business Address: 97 Mount Pleasant Road
Brantford Ontario N3T 1T5
(519) 756-2920
Business Address: Brant Community Health Care System
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: 445 Grey Street
Brantford Ontario N3S 6X1
(519) 751-7096 Extn: 2500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brant Community Health
Care System
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: John Noble Home
97 Mount Pleasant Road
Brantford Ontario N3T 1T5
Phone: (519) 756-2920
Fax: (519) 756-7942
Address: Stedman Community Hospice
Hankinson House
445 Grey Street
Brantford Ontario N3S 6X1
Phone: 5197517096
Extension: 2500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Janice M Legere Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Legere (CPSO#: 69438 )
Business Address: 97 Mount Pleasant Road
Brantford Ontario N3T 1T5
(519) 756-2920
Business Address: Brant Community Health Care System
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: 445 Grey Street
Brantford Ontario N3S 6X1
(519) 751-7096 Extn: 2500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANICE MARIE LEGERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGERE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANICE MARIE LEGERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGERE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995