THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:07:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Simcoe Clinic
279 Yonge Street-Unit 2
Barrie Ontario L4N 7T9
Phone: (705) 728-8860
Fax: (705) 737-4733
Address: 370 Bayview Dr
The Simcoe Clinic
Suite 118
Barrie ON L4N 7L3
Phone: 7057288860
Fax: 7057374733

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Austgarden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Austgarden (CPSO#: 69452 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090
Business Address: Suite 2
279 Yonge Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 7T9
(705) 728-8860
Business Address: 370 Bayview Dr
The Simcoe Clinic
Barrie ON L4N 7L3
7057288860

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Simcoe Clinic
279 Yonge Street-Unit 2
Barrie Ontario L4N 7T9
Phone: (705) 728-8860
Fax: (705) 737-4733
Address: 370 Bayview Dr
The Simcoe Clinic
Suite 118
Barrie ON L4N 7L3
Phone: 7057288860
Fax: 7057374733

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Austgarden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Austgarden (CPSO#: 69452 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090
Business Address: Suite 2
279 Yonge Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 7T9
(705) 728-8860
Business Address: 370 Bayview Dr
The Simcoe Clinic
Barrie ON L4N 7L3
7057288860

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS ALLEN AUSTGARDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUSTGARDEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS ALLEN AUSTGARDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUSTGARDEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995