THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:19:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical Academy Sofia, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AMHARIC, BULGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 303
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 272-3131
Fax: (905) 272-8284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Kebede Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kebede (CPSO#: 69494 )
Business Address: Suite 303
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4M4
(905) 272-3131

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AMHARIC, BULGARIAN
Medical School: Medical Academy Sofia, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 303
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 272-3131
Fax: (905) 272-8284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Kebede Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kebede (CPSO#: 69494 )
Business Address: Suite 303
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4M4
(905) 272-3131

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL KEBEDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEBEDE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL KEBEDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEBEDE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical Academy Sofia, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1995