THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:00:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 395 Carrie St
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-245-1550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft Bancroft
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft
LOCATION: Bancroft

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Kenneth Milne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Milne (CPSO#: 69505 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 395 Carrie St
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-245-1550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft Bancroft
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft
LOCATION: Bancroft

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Kenneth Milne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Milne (CPSO#: 69505 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM KENNETH MILNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM KENNETH MILNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1995