THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 10:56:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences Corp
Department of Paediatrics
H.S.C. - 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75658
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Findlay-Meaney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Meaney (CPSO#: 69377 ) Dr. S. Findlay (CPSO#: 69573 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Pediatrics
1280 Main Street West
Room 3A
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 75658

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences Corp
Department of Paediatrics
H.S.C. - 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75658
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Findlay-Meaney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Meaney (CPSO#: 69377 ) Dr. S. Findlay (CPSO#: 69573 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Pediatrics
1280 Main Street West
Room 3A
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 75658

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERI MICHELLE FINDLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINDLAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERI MICHELLE FINDLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINDLAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 1995