THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 15:16:07 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Services
Association of London Incorporated
268 Grosvenor Street
Box 5777
London Ontario N6A 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (514) 646-6000
Extension: 64219
Fax: (519) 646-6116
Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 58525
Fax: No Information Available
Address: University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London , Ontario
N6A 5A5
London Ontario N5V 1A1
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 34247
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 26 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paidrig Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Armstrong (CPSO#: 69648 ) Dr. S. Akhtar (CPSO#: 77344 )

Corporation Name: Saima Akhtar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Armstrong (CPSO#: 69648 ) Dr. S. Akhtar (CPSO#: 77344 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital, B Tower
800 Commissioners Road
London Ontario N6A 4G5
(519) 685-8002

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Services
Association of London Incorporated
268 Grosvenor Street
Box 5777
London Ontario N6A 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (514) 646-6000
Extension: 64219
Fax: (519) 646-6116
Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 58525
Fax: No Information Available
Address: University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London , Ontario
N6A 5A5
London Ontario N5V 1A1
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 34247
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 26 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paidrig Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Armstrong (CPSO#: 69648 ) Dr. S. Akhtar (CPSO#: 77344 )

Corporation Name: Saima Akhtar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Armstrong (CPSO#: 69648 ) Dr. S. Akhtar (CPSO#: 77344 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital, B Tower
800 Commissioners Road
London Ontario N6A 4G5
(519) 685-8002

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAIDRIG MICHAEL JOSEPH ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAIDRIG MICHAEL JOSEPH ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Oct 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 1995