THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:03:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Mysore, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KANNADA, TULU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 177 Russell Street North
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 332-1811
Fax: (519) 332-0366

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site
LOCATION: Petrolia

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pandu Shetty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Shetty (CPSO#: 69655 )
Business Address: 177 Russell St N
Sarnia ON N7T 6R5
5193321811

Corporation Name: Pandu Shetty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Dec 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KANNADA, TULU
Medical School: University of Mysore, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 177 Russell Street North
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 332-1811
Fax: (519) 332-0366

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site
LOCATION: Petrolia

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pandu Shetty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Shetty (CPSO#: 69655 )
Business Address: 177 Russell St N
Sarnia ON N7T 6R5
5193321811

Corporation Name: Pandu Shetty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Dec 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PANDURANGA YALANTHOOR SHETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETTY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PANDURANGA YALANTHOOR SHETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETTY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Mysore, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1995
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 1995