THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:46:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 500 Old Saint Patrick Ottawa
Ottawa Ontario K1N 9G4
Phone: (613) 241-3013
Fax: (613) 241-4482
Address: 168 Charlotte St
Ottawa ON K1N 8K6
Phone: 613-241-3013
Extension: 1
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 14 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benoit St-Jean Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. St-Jean (CPSO#: 69758 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2

Corporation Name: Dr. Benoit St-Jean Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jan 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 500 Old Saint Patrick Ottawa
Ottawa Ontario K1N 9G4
Phone: (613) 241-3013
Fax: (613) 241-4482
Address: 168 Charlotte St
Ottawa ON K1N 8K6
Phone: 613-241-3013
Extension: 1
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 14 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benoit St-Jean Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. St-Jean (CPSO#: 69758 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2

Corporation Name: Dr. Benoit St-Jean Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jan 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENOIT ST-JEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST-JEAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENOIT ST-JEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST-JEAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1996
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 1996