THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 07:14:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Population Health Research Inst
David Braley Cardiac Vascular and
Stroke Research Institute
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 40654
Fax: (905) 297-3778
Address: Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic
Room 346
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 40654
Fax: (905) 297-3778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Devereaux Douglas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Douglas (CPSO#: 70512 ) Dr. P. Devereaux (CPSO#: 69774 )
Business Address: The Meadows LTC.
12 Tranquility Avenue
Ancaster Ontario L9G 5C2
(905) 304-1993

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Population Health Research Inst
David Braley Cardiac Vascular and
Stroke Research Institute
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 40654
Fax: (905) 297-3778
Address: Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic
Room 346
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 40654
Fax: (905) 297-3778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Devereaux Douglas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Douglas (CPSO#: 70512 ) Dr. P. Devereaux (CPSO#: 69774 )
Business Address: The Meadows LTC.
12 Tranquility Avenue
Ancaster Ontario L9G 5C2
(905) 304-1993

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP JAMES DEVEREAUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVEREAUX is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP JAMES DEVEREAUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVEREAUX is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Mar 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 1996