THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:57:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IGBO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-2545 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N8X 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Victoria Cardiac Care
61 Dover St
Chatham Ontario N7L 1S7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 43 King Street West
Victoria Cardiac Care
Harrow ON N0R 1G0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 510 Southdale Road East
SUITE 104
London Ontario N6E 0B2
Phone: 2267770902
Fax: 2267770419
Address: Unit 130
5 Ouellette Place
Windsor Ontario N8X 1L9
Phone: (519) 250-4449
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Novamed
2646 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 987-0611
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: No Information Available
Address: NovaMed Diagnostics
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CMR Diagnostics
2 - 630 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8X 4W2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 - 2475 McDougall Ave
Windsor Ontario N8X 1T3
Phone: (519) 966-0089
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 250 TECUMSEH RD EAST
Windsor Ontario N8X 2R3
Phone: 226 773 1413
Fax: 226 773 0951
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 May 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 15 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nwadiaro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nwadiaro (CPSO#: 69839 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IGBO
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-2545 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N8X 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Victoria Cardiac Care
61 Dover St
Chatham Ontario N7L 1S7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 43 King Street West
Victoria Cardiac Care
Harrow ON N0R 1G0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 510 Southdale Road East
SUITE 104
London Ontario N6E 0B2
Phone: 2267770902
Fax: 2267770419
Address: Unit 130
5 Ouellette Place
Windsor Ontario N8X 1L9
Phone: (519) 250-4449
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Novamed
2646 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 987-0611
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: No Information Available
Address: NovaMed Diagnostics
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CMR Diagnostics
2 - 630 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8X 4W2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 - 2475 McDougall Ave
Windsor Ontario N8X 1T3
Phone: (519) 966-0089
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 250 TECUMSEH RD EAST
Windsor Ontario N8X 2R3
Phone: 226 773 1413
Fax: 226 773 0951
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 May 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 15 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nwadiaro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nwadiaro (CPSO#: 69839 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NDUKA FRANCIS NWADIARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NWADIARO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NDUKA FRANCIS NWADIARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NWADIARO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 1996