THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:22:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Roundhouse Pediatrics
590 Annette Street
Toronto Ontario M6S 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 769-5437
Fax: (647) 689-3093

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 03 Nov 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Saxena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Saxena (CPSO#: 69840 )
Business Address: 590 Annette Street
Toronto Ontario M6S 2C4
(416) 769-5437

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Roundhouse Pediatrics
590 Annette Street
Toronto Ontario M6S 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 769-5437
Fax: (647) 689-3093

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 03 Nov 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Saxena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Saxena (CPSO#: 69840 )
Business Address: 590 Annette Street
Toronto Ontario M6S 2C4
(416) 769-5437

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAHUL SAXENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAXENA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAHUL SAXENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAXENA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 May 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 May 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 May 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 1996