THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:41:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 602
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 953-7917
Fax: (905) 953-0046
Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Phone: 705-728-9090
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Dr
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: 9058954521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 14 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lorne Goldman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Goldman (CPSO#: 69855 )
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9802
Business Address: 581 Davis Drive
Suite 602
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
(905) 953-7917

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 602
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 953-7917
Fax: (905) 953-0046
Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Phone: 705-728-9090
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Dr
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: 9058954521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 14 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lorne Goldman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Goldman (CPSO#: 69855 )
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9802
Business Address: 581 Davis Drive
Suite 602
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
(905) 953-7917

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORNE ERIC GOLDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORNE ERIC GOLDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 May 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 May 1996