THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:12:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 675-4733
Fax: (705) 671-5458

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Dentistry Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Dentistry
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Health Sciences North Sudbury
North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place Sudbury
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Dumais Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dumais (CPSO#: 69891 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-4733

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 675-4733
Fax: (705) 671-5458

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Dentistry Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Dentistry
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Health Sciences North Sudbury
North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place Sudbury
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Dumais Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dumais (CPSO#: 69891 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-4733

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT CHARLES DUMAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUMAIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT CHARLES DUMAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUMAIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996