THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 09:41:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Fax: (613) 737-8189

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Costache Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Thompson (CPSO#: 69015 ) Dr. I. Costache (CPSO#: 69893 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8187

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Fax: (613) 737-8189

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Costache Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Thompson (CPSO#: 69015 ) Dr. I. Costache (CPSO#: 69893 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8187

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IOANA COSTACHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTACHE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IOANA COSTACHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTACHE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996