THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:28:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Temiskaming Hospital
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 647-1088
Extension: 2434
Fax: (705) 647-1065

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Jan 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: Englehart and District Hospital
LOCATION: Englehart

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Leger-Nolet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Leger-Nolet (CPSO#: 69894 )
Business Address: Temiskaming Hospital
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
(705) 647-1722

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Temiskaming Hospital
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 647-1088
Extension: 2434
Fax: (705) 647-1065

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Jan 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: Englehart and District Hospital
LOCATION: Englehart

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Leger-Nolet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Leger-Nolet (CPSO#: 69894 )
Business Address: Temiskaming Hospital
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
(705) 647-1722

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CELINE NICOLE LEGER-NOLET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGER-NOLET is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CELINE NICOLE LEGER-NOLET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGER-NOLET is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996