THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:15:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 415 Water St
Peterborough ON K9H 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-313-4488
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hoa C. Pham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Pham (CPSO#: 69900 )
Business Address: 415 Water Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 3L9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 415 Water St
Peterborough ON K9H 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-313-4488
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hoa C. Pham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Pham (CPSO#: 69900 )
Business Address: 415 Water Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 3L9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOA CONG PHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOA CONG PHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996