THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:05:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-16 Amy Croft Dr
Windsor ON N9K 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 979 5171
Fax: 519 979 5141

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexandra Figaro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Figaro (CPSO#: 69904 )
Business Address: 6 - 500 Manning Road
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 5H3
(519) 979-5171
Business Address: 1-16 Amy Croft Dr
Windsor ON N9K 0A1
5199795171

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-16 Amy Croft Dr
Windsor ON N9K 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 979 5171
Fax: 519 979 5141

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexandra Figaro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Figaro (CPSO#: 69904 )
Business Address: 6 - 500 Manning Road
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 5H3
(519) 979-5171
Business Address: 1-16 Amy Croft Dr
Windsor ON N9K 0A1
5199795171

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA FIGARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIGARO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA FIGARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIGARO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996