THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:05:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3179 Highway 69 N
Suite 2
Val Caron Ontario P3N 1S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 222-1888
Fax: 7058972700
Address: Health Care Walk-In Clinic
1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury Ontario P3A 1Y4
Phone: (705) 222-1364
Fax: (705) 521-0729
Address: 1-1485 Bancroft Dr
Sudbury ON P3B 1R6
Phone: 7052223372
Fax: 7058972700

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Fredette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Fredette (CPSO#: 69909 )
Business Address: 3179 Highway 69 North
Suite 2
Val Caron Ontario P3N 1S5
(705) 222-1888

Corporation Name: Fredette and Krawczuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Mar 2018

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Fredette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Mar 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3179 Highway 69 N
Suite 2
Val Caron Ontario P3N 1S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 222-1888
Fax: 7058972700
Address: Health Care Walk-In Clinic
1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury Ontario P3A 1Y4
Phone: (705) 222-1364
Fax: (705) 521-0729
Address: 1-1485 Bancroft Dr
Sudbury ON P3B 1R6
Phone: 7052223372
Fax: 7058972700

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Fredette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Fredette (CPSO#: 69909 )
Business Address: 3179 Highway 69 North
Suite 2
Val Caron Ontario P3N 1S5
(705) 222-1888

Corporation Name: Fredette and Krawczuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Mar 2018

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Fredette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Mar 2016

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL PIERRE FREDETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREDETTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL PIERRE FREDETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREDETTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996