THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:16:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 17000 Stn Forces
Canadian Forces Health
Services Centre
CFB Kingston
Kingston ON K7K 7B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 541 5010
Extension: 6994
Fax: 613 541 6891
Address: PO Box 17000 Stn Forces
Canadian Forces Health
Services Centre
CFB Kingston
Kingston ON K7K 7B4
Phone: 6135415010
Fax: 6135414465
Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684 -600
Fax: (807) 684-5875

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Franklin H. Sim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sim (CPSO#: 69931 )
Business Address: 201-1260 Golf Links Rd
Fort William Clinic
Shared Mental Health
Suite 201
Thunder Bay ON P7B 0A1
807 626 1233
Business Address: 301 Lillie Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 0A6
(807) 684-5105
Business Address: Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
(613) 342-2522
Business Address: 25 Front Avenue West
Brockville Ontario K6V 4J2
(613) 342-2262 Extn: 5546
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
710 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 5P7
(807) 624-3400
Business Address: PO Box 17000 Stn Forces
Kingston ON K7K 7B4
613 541 5010 Extn: 5776

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 17000 Stn Forces
Canadian Forces Health
Services Centre
CFB Kingston
Kingston ON K7K 7B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 541 5010
Extension: 6994
Fax: 613 541 6891
Address: PO Box 17000 Stn Forces
Canadian Forces Health
Services Centre
CFB Kingston
Kingston ON K7K 7B4
Phone: 6135415010
Fax: 6135414465
Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684 -600
Fax: (807) 684-5875

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Franklin H. Sim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sim (CPSO#: 69931 )
Business Address: 201-1260 Golf Links Rd
Fort William Clinic
Shared Mental Health
Suite 201
Thunder Bay ON P7B 0A1
807 626 1233
Business Address: 301 Lillie Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 0A6
(807) 684-5105
Business Address: Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
(613) 342-2522
Business Address: 25 Front Avenue West
Brockville Ontario K6V 4J2
(613) 342-2262 Extn: 5546
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
710 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 5P7
(807) 624-3400
Business Address: PO Box 17000 Stn Forces
Kingston ON K7K 7B4
613 541 5010 Extn: 5776

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANKLIN HINDSON SIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANKLIN HINDSON SIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996