THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:38:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Cook St
Dr. N Sauriol Family Practice
Meaford ON N4L 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-682-0888
Fax: 519-599-5895
Address: 229 Nelson Street West
Brightshores Health System- Meaford Hospital
Meaford Ontario N4L 1A3
Phone: (519) 538-1311
Fax: (519) 599-5895

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sauriol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sauriol (CPSO#: 69941 )
Business Address: 89 Cook St
Meaford ON N4L 1N2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Cook St
Dr. N Sauriol Family Practice
Meaford ON N4L 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-682-0888
Fax: 519-599-5895
Address: 229 Nelson Street West
Brightshores Health System- Meaford Hospital
Meaford Ontario N4L 1A3
Phone: (519) 538-1311
Fax: (519) 599-5895

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sauriol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sauriol (CPSO#: 69941 )
Business Address: 89 Cook St
Meaford ON N4L 1N2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHALIE SAURIOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAURIOL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHALIE SAURIOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAURIOL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996