THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:55:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: 905 848 7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3545 Odyssey Drive
West GTA endoscopy clinic
Mississauga Ontario L5M 7N4
Phone: 905 823 0223
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Soni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Soni (CPSO#: 69942 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-4530

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: 905 848 7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3545 Odyssey Drive
West GTA endoscopy clinic
Mississauga Ontario L5M 7N4
Phone: 905 823 0223
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Soni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Soni (CPSO#: 69942 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-4530

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEEPA SONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEEPA SONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On  July 4, 2019, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Deepa Soni in respect of an incident that took place in December, 2007.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On  July 4, 2019, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Deepa Soni in respect of an incident that took place in December, 2007.

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996