THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:43:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: City of Lakes Family Health Team
Pioneer Manor Site
Unit C
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 560-1018
Fax: (705) 566-7617

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Gibb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gibb (CPSO#: 69947 )
Business Address: City of Lakes Family Health Team
Pioneer Manor Site
Unit C
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2T4
(705) 560-1018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: City of Lakes Family Health Team
Pioneer Manor Site
Unit C
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 560-1018
Fax: (705) 566-7617

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Gibb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gibb (CPSO#: 69947 )
Business Address: City of Lakes Family Health Team
Pioneer Manor Site
Unit C
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2T4
(705) 560-1018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL STEWART GIBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIBB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL STEWART GIBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIBB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996