THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:27:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-663-3319
Fax: (519) 663-3449

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John F. Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Johnson (CPSO#: 69965 )
Business Address: PO Box 5339 Stn B
London ON N6A 5A5

Corporation Name: John F. Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Jun 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-663-3319
Fax: (519) 663-3449

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John F. Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Johnson (CPSO#: 69965 )
Business Address: PO Box 5339 Stn B
London ON N6A 5A5

Corporation Name: John F. Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Jun 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN FRANCIS JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN FRANCIS JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996