THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:11:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: North Colombo Medical College, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1885 Glenanna Road
Suite 205
Pickering Ontario L1V 6R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 839-2214
Fax: (905) 839-7357

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Piyal Walpola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Walpola (CPSO#: 69976 )
Business Address: 205 - 1885 Glenanna Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 6R6
(905) 839-2214

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE
Medical School: North Colombo Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1885 Glenanna Road
Suite 205
Pickering Ontario L1V 6R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 839-2214
Fax: (905) 839-7357

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Piyal Walpola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Walpola (CPSO#: 69976 )
Business Address: 205 - 1885 Glenanna Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 6R6
(905) 839-2214

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIYAL LASITHA WALPOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALPOLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIYAL LASITHA WALPOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALPOLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: North Colombo Medical College, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996