THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:54:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-678 Main St E
Aboriginal Health Centre
Hamilton ON L8M 1K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905- 544- 4320
Fax: 905- 544- 4247
Address: 678 Main Street East, Suite 200
Hamilton, ON L8M 1K2
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1K2
Phone: 905-544-4320
Fax: 905-544-4247
Address: Misiway Milopemahtesewin CHC
Primary Care
130 Wilson Ave, Timmins, ON P4N 2S9
Phone: 705-264-2200
Fax: 705-267-5688

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monica Borkar-Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Borkar-Aggarwal (CPSO#: 69989 )
Business Address: 678 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1K2

Corporation Name: Monica Borkar-Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Dec 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-678 Main St E
Aboriginal Health Centre
Hamilton ON L8M 1K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905- 544- 4320
Fax: 905- 544- 4247
Address: 678 Main Street East, Suite 200
Hamilton, ON L8M 1K2
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1K2
Phone: 905-544-4320
Fax: 905-544-4247
Address: Misiway Milopemahtesewin CHC
Primary Care
130 Wilson Ave, Timmins, ON P4N 2S9
Phone: 705-264-2200
Fax: 705-267-5688

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monica Borkar-Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Borkar-Aggarwal (CPSO#: 69989 )
Business Address: 678 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1K2

Corporation Name: Monica Borkar-Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Dec 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA BORKAR-AGGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORKAR-AGGARWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA BORKAR-AGGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORKAR-AGGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996