THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:44:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Village Park Paediatrics
Suite 405
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 3B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 516-4111
Fax: (416) 516-1104
Address: Department of Pediatric Emergency
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Saint Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6625
Fax: (416) 530-6294

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lau (CPSO#: 69999 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6690
Business Address: Village Park Paediatrics
Suite 405
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 3B2
(416) 516-4111
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-5550

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Village Park Paediatrics
Suite 405
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 3B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 516-4111
Fax: (416) 516-1104
Address: Department of Pediatric Emergency
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Saint Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6625
Fax: (416) 530-6294

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lau (CPSO#: 69999 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6690
Business Address: Village Park Paediatrics
Suite 405
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 3B2
(416) 516-4111
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-5550

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDDY CHI-HO LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDDY CHI-HO LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996