THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:08:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 104, 1929 Russell Road
Ottawa Ontario K1G 4G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 288-1065
Fax: (613) 907-1712

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Shamsian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Shamsian (CPSO#: 70008 )
Business Address: Suite 104
1929 Russell Road
Ottawa Ontario K1G 4G3
(613) 288-1065

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 104, 1929 Russell Road
Ottawa Ontario K1G 4G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 288-1065
Fax: (613) 907-1712

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Shamsian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Shamsian (CPSO#: 70008 )
Business Address: Suite 104
1929 Russell Road
Ottawa Ontario K1G 4G3
(613) 288-1065

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELHAM SHAMSIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMSIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELHAM SHAMSIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMSIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996