THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:30:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4456 Limebank Road, Unit 7
Ottawa Ontario K1V 2N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 425-0588
Fax: (613) 692-0732
Address: 1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2G 3H8
Phone: (613) 727-1072
Fax: (613) 727-5873

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.M. Daniel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Daniel (CPSO#: 70011 )
Business Address: 4456 Limebank Road
Suite 7
Ottawa Ontario K1V 2N8
(613) 425-0588
Business Address: 1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2G 3H8
(613) 727-1072 Extn: 222

Corporation Name: Dr. Arkadiusz Daniel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Mar 2010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4456 Limebank Road, Unit 7
Ottawa Ontario K1V 2N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 425-0588
Fax: (613) 692-0732
Address: 1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2G 3H8
Phone: (613) 727-1072
Fax: (613) 727-5873

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.M. Daniel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Daniel (CPSO#: 70011 )
Business Address: 4456 Limebank Road
Suite 7
Ottawa Ontario K1V 2N8
(613) 425-0588
Business Address: 1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2G 3H8
(613) 727-1072 Extn: 222

Corporation Name: Dr. Arkadiusz Daniel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Mar 2010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARKADIUSZ MIECZYSLAW DANIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARKADIUSZ MIECZYSLAW DANIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996