THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:52:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 273-4100
Extension: 4
Fax: (519) 273-3208

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcie McCune Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McCune (CPSO#: 70021 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 273-4100
Extension: 4
Fax: (519) 273-3208

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcie McCune Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McCune (CPSO#: 70021 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCIE LEE MCCUNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCUNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCIE LEE MCCUNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCUNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996