THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:35:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 545 King Street West
Parkview Nursing LTCF
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053793970
Fax: 9055258717

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David F. Yanover Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yanover (CPSO#: 70042 )
Business Address: 545 King St W
Hamilton ON L8P 1C1
(905) 529-3211

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 545 King Street West
Parkview Nursing LTCF
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053793970
Fax: 9055258717

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David F. Yanover Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yanover (CPSO#: 70042 )
Business Address: 545 King St W
Hamilton ON L8P 1C1
(905) 529-3211

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID FREDERICK YANOVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANOVER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID FREDERICK YANOVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANOVER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 27 Sep 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996