THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:54:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cobblestone Medicine and Rehab
Unit 8
1084 Rest Acres Road
Paris Ontario N3L 0B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 442-7674
Fax: (289) 975-4364
Address: Fox Ridge Care Community
389 West Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 3V9
Phone: (519) 759-4666
Fax: (519) 759-0200
Address: 70 King Edward St
Queensview Retirement Community
Paris ON N3L 0C1
Phone: 5194425621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ross Male Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Male (CPSO#: 70059 )
Business Address: Cobblestone Medicine and Rehab
Unit 8
1084 Rest Acres Road
Paris Ontario N3L 0B5
(519) 442-7674

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cobblestone Medicine and Rehab
Unit 8
1084 Rest Acres Road
Paris Ontario N3L 0B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 442-7674
Fax: (289) 975-4364
Address: Fox Ridge Care Community
389 West Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 3V9
Phone: (519) 759-4666
Fax: (519) 759-0200
Address: 70 King Edward St
Queensview Retirement Community
Paris ON N3L 0C1
Phone: 5194425621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ross Male Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Male (CPSO#: 70059 )
Business Address: Cobblestone Medicine and Rehab
Unit 8
1084 Rest Acres Road
Paris Ontario N3L 0B5
(519) 442-7674

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSS SHELDON MALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSS SHELDON MALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Jan 1999
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 1999

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 1998
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996