THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:05:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 85 Norfolk St, No 305
Guelph Ontario N1H 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 836-9440
Fax: (519) 836-9530
Address: 115 Delhi St
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Phone: 519 822-5350
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 255 Elizabeth St E
Listowel Ontario N4W 2P5
Phone: 519 291-3120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Katherine J. Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Miller (CPSO#: 70075 )
Business Address: Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2P5
(519) 291-3210
Business Address: Suite 305
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph Ontario N1H 4J2
(519) 766-1490
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 85 Norfolk St, No 305
Guelph Ontario N1H 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 836-9440
Fax: (519) 836-9530
Address: 115 Delhi St
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Phone: 519 822-5350
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 255 Elizabeth St E
Listowel Ontario N4W 2P5
Phone: 519 291-3120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Katherine J. Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Miller (CPSO#: 70075 )
Business Address: Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2P5
(519) 291-3210
Business Address: Suite 305
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph Ontario N1H 4J2
(519) 766-1490
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHERINE JUDITH MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHERINE JUDITH MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996