THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:47:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Doctors on Bayview
15900 Bayview Avenue
Aurora Ontario L4G 7Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 726-9755
Fax: (905) 726-9631
Address: Hellenic Home for the Aged
2411 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 4X1
Phone: (416) 654-7700
Fax: (416) 654-0943

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George Vavougios Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Vavougios (CPSO#: 70081 )
Business Address: Hellenic Home for the Aged
2411 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 4X1
(416) 654-7718
Business Address: Doctors on Bayview
15900 Bayview Avenue
Aurora Ontario L4G 7Y3
(905) 726-9755

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Doctors on Bayview
15900 Bayview Avenue
Aurora Ontario L4G 7Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 726-9755
Fax: (905) 726-9631
Address: Hellenic Home for the Aged
2411 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 4X1
Phone: (416) 654-7700
Fax: (416) 654-0943

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George Vavougios Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Vavougios (CPSO#: 70081 )
Business Address: Hellenic Home for the Aged
2411 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 4X1
(416) 654-7718
Business Address: Doctors on Bayview
15900 Bayview Avenue
Aurora Ontario L4G 7Y3
(905) 726-9755

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE VAVOUGIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAVOUGIOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE VAVOUGIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAVOUGIOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996