THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:21:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3695 Keele Street
Downsview Ontario M3J 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 633-3711
Fax: (416) 633-0521

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Winkler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Winkler (CPSO#: 70096 )
Business Address: 104-3695 Keele Street
Downsview Ontario M3J 1N2
(416) 633-3711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3695 Keele Street
Downsview Ontario M3J 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 633-3711
Fax: (416) 633-0521

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Winkler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Winkler (CPSO#: 70096 )
Business Address: 104-3695 Keele Street
Downsview Ontario M3J 1N2
(416) 633-3711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER DEBRA WINKLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINKLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER DEBRA WINKLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINKLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996