THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:16:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-1661
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Tecumseh Road East
MOVE Sports Medicine
Suite #122
Windsor Ontario N8X 4W2
Phone: 519-254-4451
Fax: 519-256-8926

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Woodall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Woodall (CPSO#: 70100 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4444
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: 122-700 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8X 4T2
519-254-4451

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-1661
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Tecumseh Road East
MOVE Sports Medicine
Suite #122
Windsor Ontario N8X 4W2
Phone: 519-254-4451
Fax: 519-256-8926

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Woodall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Woodall (CPSO#: 70100 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4444
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: 122-700 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8X 4T2
519-254-4451

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES WOODALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES WOODALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 09 Jun 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 09 Jun 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996