THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:36:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site, McMaster Clinic
McMaster University
237 Barton Street RM 411
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44599
Fax: (905) 577-1418
Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44599
Fax: (905) 577-1418

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ally P.H. Prebtani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Prebtani (CPSO#: 70107 )
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site, McMaster Clinic
McMaster University
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 44599

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site, McMaster Clinic
McMaster University
237 Barton Street RM 411
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44599
Fax: (905) 577-1418
Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44599
Fax: (905) 577-1418

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ally P.H. Prebtani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Prebtani (CPSO#: 70107 )
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site, McMaster Clinic
McMaster University
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 44599

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLY-KAREEM PYARALI HABIB PREBTANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREBTANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLY-KAREEM PYARALI HABIB PREBTANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREBTANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 29 Sep 2005
Summary of Decision:
On September 29, 2005, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Prebtani committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice medicine. The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that the Registrar suspend Dr. Prebtani(s certificate of registration for three (3) months, commencing thirty (30) days after the date of this order, two (2) months of which suspension shall be suspended provided that Dr. Prebtani successfully completes, at his own expense, a College-approved Boundaries Course and a College-approved Anger Management Course and provides proof thereof to the College.

Dr. Prebtani appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court on October 19, 2005, which stayed the decision of the Discipline Committee pending the outcome of the appeal. On December 8, 2008, Dr. Prebtani discontinued his appeal. Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee is in effect.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 2008-12-08
Hearing Date(s): Sep 29, 2005

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 29 Sep 2005
Summary of Decision:
On September 29, 2005, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Prebtani committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice medicine. The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that the Registrar suspend Dr. Prebtani(s certificate of registration for three (3) months, commencing thirty (30) days after the date of this order, two (2) months of which suspension shall be suspended provided that Dr. Prebtani successfully completes, at his own expense, a College-approved Boundaries Course and a College-approved Anger Management Course and provides proof thereof to the College.

Dr. Prebtani appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court on October 19, 2005, which stayed the decision of the Discipline Committee pending the outcome of the appeal. On December 8, 2008, Dr. Prebtani discontinued his appeal. Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee is in effect.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 2008-12-08
Hearing Date(s): Sep 29, 2005

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 08 Feb 2009
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 09 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2009

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996