THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:58:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 385 Frederick St
unit 16
Kitchener ON N2H 2P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-745-7482
Fax: 8556581456

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Grosso Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Grosso (CPSO#: 70326 ) Dr. M. Quartermain (CPSO#: 70126 )
Business Address: Suite 115
675 Queen Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1A1
(519) 603-0623
Business Address: 1-435 King St N
Waterloo ON N2J 2Z5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 385 Frederick St
unit 16
Kitchener ON N2H 2P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-745-7482
Fax: 8556581456

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Grosso Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Grosso (CPSO#: 70326 ) Dr. M. Quartermain (CPSO#: 70126 )
Business Address: Suite 115
675 Queen Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1A1
(519) 603-0623
Business Address: 1-435 King St N
Waterloo ON N2J 2Z5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANIE ANNE QUARTERMAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUARTERMAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANIE ANNE QUARTERMAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUARTERMAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996