THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:51:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fowler Kennedy 3M Centre
Sport Medicine Clinic
Western University
1151 Richmond Street
London Ontario N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 661-4121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin R. Willits Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Willits (CPSO#: 70147 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fowler Kennedy 3M Centre
Sport Medicine Clinic
Western University
1151 Richmond Street
London Ontario N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 661-4121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin R. Willits Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Willits (CPSO#: 70147 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN ROY WILLITS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLITS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN ROY WILLITS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLITS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 25 Apr 2024
Summary:
Finding of Guilt

Kevin Willits was found guilty of the following offence:

1.  Operating a vehicle with over 80mg blood alcohol, contrary to section 320.14(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date:  April 25, 2024
SENTENCE:  1 year driving prohibition; Fine of $1,500; Victim surcharge of $450

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 25 Apr 2024
Summary:
Finding of Guilt

Kevin Willits was found guilty of the following offence:

1.  Operating a vehicle with over 80mg blood alcohol, contrary to section 320.14(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date:  April 25, 2024
SENTENCE:  1 year driving prohibition; Fine of $1,500; Victim surcharge of $450

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996