THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:43:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brameast Family Physicians
Suite 38
2130 Northpark Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 792-2211
Fax: (905) 792-2901

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Hoornweg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hoornweg (CPSO#: 70149 )
Business Address: Brameast Family Physicians
Suite 38
2130 Northpark Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
(905) 792-2211

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brameast Family Physicians
Suite 38
2130 Northpark Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 792-2211
Fax: (905) 792-2901

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Hoornweg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hoornweg (CPSO#: 70149 )
Business Address: Brameast Family Physicians
Suite 38
2130 Northpark Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
(905) 792-2211

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN LYNNE HOORNWEG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOORNWEG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN LYNNE HOORNWEG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOORNWEG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996