THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:18:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 27-1077 North Service Rd
Mississauga ON L4Y 1A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Humber College Health Centre
205 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 5L7
Phone: (416) 675-6622
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosalinda Asaro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Asaro (CPSO#: 70153 )
Business Address: Health Centre
205 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 5L7
(416) 675-6622
Business Address: 27-1077 North Service Road
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1A6
(905) 949-1700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 27-1077 North Service Rd
Mississauga ON L4Y 1A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Humber College Health Centre
205 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 5L7
Phone: (416) 675-6622
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosalinda Asaro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Asaro (CPSO#: 70153 )
Business Address: Health Centre
205 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 5L7
(416) 675-6622
Business Address: 27-1077 North Service Road
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1A6
(905) 949-1700

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSALINDA ASARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASARO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSALINDA ASARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASARO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996